Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Complete Logistics Company, Inc. v. Internal Revenue Service
DistrictCentral District of California
CityEastern Division - Riverside
Case Number5:2018cv02287
Date Filed2018-10-26
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dolly M. Gee
PlaintiffThe Complete Logistics Company, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Complete Logistics Company submitted three FOIA requests to the IRS for records concerning the agency's investigation of the company. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. It disclosed 304 pages in response to the company's first request. Its second and third requests were for an Activity Record. The agency responded to the second request by telling the company that it found no responsive records. After hearing nothing further from the agency concerning its third request, the company filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantInternal Revenue Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-261COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22646967 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Chad Nardiello added to party The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.(pty:pla))(Nardiello, Chad) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-262CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. (Nardiello, Chad) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-263* SUMMONS REQUEST * filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. (Nardiello, Chad) Modified on 10/26/2018 (esa). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-264* SUMMONS REQUEST * filed as Request for Clerk to Issue Subpoena filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.., Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. (Nardiello, Chad) Modified on 10/26/2018 (esa). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-265Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. (Nardiello, Chad) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-266Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. (Nardiello, Chad) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-267NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc., identifying The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. (Nardiello, Chad) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-268NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff The Complete Logistics Company, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:17-mc-74-DMG; 5:18-cv-1680-DMG; 2:18-cv-6886-DMG; 2:18-cv-6880-DMG (Nardiello, Chad) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-269NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2610NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-261160 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendant Internal Revenue Service (Attorney General) (esa) Modified on 10/26/2018 (esa). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-261260 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendant Internal Revenue Service (Clerk). (esa) Modified on 10/26/2018 (esa). (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-261360 DAY Summons issued re Complaint 1 as to defendant Internal Revenue Service (Commissioner). (esa) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-2914ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:17-mc-00074 DMG(MRWx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:18-cv-02287 DMG(MRWx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-3015MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for details. (lom) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-0116INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar