Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMoore v. Riverside Regional Medical Cental et al
DistrictEastern District of Virginia
CityRichmond
Case Number3:2018cv00730
Date Filed2018-10-25
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge John A. Gibney, Jr
PlaintiffJeffrey Lee Moore
Case DescriptionJeffrey Moore filed suit against the Riverside Regional Medical Center for medial malpractice. This is not a FOIA claim.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantRiverside Regional Medical Cental
Defendant10 John Does
Defendant10 Jane Does
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-251COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey Lee Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Doc, # 2 Letter, # 3 Envelope)(ccol, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-252MOTION For Judgement re 1 Complaint by Jeffrey Lee Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(ccol, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
2018-10-303Second Motion for Judgment by Jeffrey Lee Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Envelope) (smej, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-074MEMORANDUM ORDER that this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof; Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiff's trust fund account for 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. Accordingly, the Motions for Judgment ECF Nos. 2 and 3 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. See Order for more details and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/7/2018. Forms mailed to Prisoner: IFP, Consent to Collection Forms and Memorandum Order. Inmate Account Form mailed to Institution.(ccol, ) (ccol, ) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar