Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWILDEARTH GUARDIANS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02498
Date Filed2018-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffWILDEARTH GUARDIANS a New Mexico non-profit corporation
Case DescriptionWildEarth Guardians submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning a report entitled "Review of Department of Interior Actions That Potentially Burden Domestic Energy." The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and placed it on its complex track for processing. WildEarth Guardians made several more inquiries as to the status of its request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, WildEarth Guardians filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR a department of the United States Executive Branch
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-291COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5763882) filed by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet , # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-292MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Emma A. O. Bruden, :Firm- Kampmeier & Knutsen,, :Address- P.O. Box 15099 Portland, Oregon 97293. Phone No. - (503) 719-5641. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5763892. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Declaration DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting DECLARATION OF EMMA BRUDEN IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-293LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Bahr, David) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-31Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zsb) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-314SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-12-065RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/6/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/6/2018. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-066RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 11/5/2018 (Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-067RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/06/18. (Bahr, David) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-068ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Kahn, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-209Joint MOTION to Modify case management schedule and set disclosure schedule by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF ORDER REVISING CASE SCHEDULE)(Bahr, David) Modified event title on 12/28/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2210ORDER granting and adopting 9 joint motion for a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/22/2018. (lcrcl1) Modified on 12/26/2018 (zlsj). (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2018-12-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/8/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-02-0111Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0112SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/1/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-2113Joint STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULE by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 02/21/2019)
2019-02-2714SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/26/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-2115Joint STATUS REPORT and agreed disclosure order by WILDEARTH GUARDIANS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahr, David) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-1116SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/11/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 04/11/2019)
2019-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/26/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar