Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJordan v. District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
DistrictDistrict of South Carolina
CityColumbia
Case Number3:2018cv02924
Date Filed2018-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr
PlaintiffDiana Jordan
Case DescriptionDiana Jordan filed suit against the District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence for damages during a flood. This is not a FOIA case.
Complaint issues: FOIA not mentioned

DefendantDistrict 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-291COMPLAINT against District 5 Foundation for Educational Excellence, filed by Diana Jordan. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Envelope) (bgoo) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-293MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Diana Jordan. Response to Motion due by 11/13/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) Motions referred to Shiva V. Hodges. (bgoo) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-018REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the district judge deny Plaintiff's 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If the district judge accepts this recommendation, it is further recommended Plaintiff be allowed 14 days from the date of the order denying indigent status to submit the required $400 filing fee. Objections to R&R due by 11/15/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shiva V. Hodges on 11/1/2018. (lbak) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-019***DOCUMENT MAILED 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION placed in U.S. Mail to Diana Jordan. (lbak) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-0511OBJECTION to 8 Report and Recommendation by Diana Jordan. Reply to Objections due by 11/19/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents, # 2 Envelope) (bgoo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar