Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc. v. United States Department of Justice
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv05007
Date Filed2018-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Eleanor L. Ross
PlaintiffSoutheastern Legal Foundation, Inc.
Case DescriptionThe Southeastern Legal Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records relating to extradition requests made pursuant to the 1978 Extradition Treaty between the United States and Mexico. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Southeastern Legal Foundation filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-301COMPLAINT filed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8240718. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Summons AG, # 5 Proposed Summons US Atty, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtj) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-302Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Attorney General Jeff Sessions) (jtj) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-10-303Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc. (jtj) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-014NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-05Clerks Notation re 3 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
2018-11-095Return of Service Executed by Southeastern Legal Foundation, Inc.. United States Department of Justice served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Department of Justice, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service - U.S. Attorney NDGA)(Hermann, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar