Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCvijanovich v. United States Secret Service
DistrictDistrict of North Dakota
CityEastern
Case Number3:2018cv00220
Date Filed2018-10-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal
PlaintiffDaniel Edward Cvijanovich
Case DescriptionDaniel Cvijanovich, who was convicted of verbally threatening President George W. Bush in 2007, submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Secret Service for records concerning himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied the request under Exemption 7(A) (interference with ongoing investigation or proceeding). Cvijanovich filed an administrative appeal, which was also denied. Cvijanovich then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Secret Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-301COMPLAINT against United States Secret Service (Filing fee $400, receipt number 319000043) filed by Daniel Edward Cvijanovich. (Attachments: # 1 List of Attachments, # 2 Letter from Daniel Cvijanovich dated December 1, 2017, # 3 Letter from Kim E. Campbell, SAIC, dated April 9, 2018, # 4 Letter from Daniel Svijanovich dated June 2, 2018, # 5 Letter from Deputy Director William J. Callahan dated July 31, 2018, # 6 Affidavit of Daniel Cvijanovich, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet) (as) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-302Summons Issued as to United States Secret Service, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (as) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-303NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Daniel Edward Cvijanovich. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 11/13/2018. (as) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-10-304CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Daniel Edward Cvijanovich. (as) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
2018-11-165SUMMONS Returned Executed as to United States Secret Service served on 11/5/2018, answer due 1/4/2019. (as) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-12-036NOTICE of Appearance by James P. Thomas on behalf of United States Secret Service (Thomas, James) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-037ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by United States Secret Service.(Thomas, James) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-048NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to United States Secret Service. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 12/18/2018. (js) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-049CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by United States Secret Service. (lh) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-0410ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Defendant's counsel shall initiate the call into chambers at 701-297-7070. (CS) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-1111MOTION to Stay re 10 Order,, Set Hearings, Discovery, and set Dispositive Motion Deadlines by United States Secret Service. (Thomas, James) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1212ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal denying 11 Motion to Stay. (CS) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2019-01-0313MOTION to Stay Action Due to Lapse of Appropriations by United States Secret Service. (Thomas, James) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-0414ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting 13 Motion to Stay. (AS) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-04Deadlines and Hearings Terminated. Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2019 at 09:30 AM is CANCELLED. See written order at Doc. 14 . (AS) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-2815NOTICE by United States Secret Service regard Appropriations (Thomas, James) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2916ORDER LIFTING STAY by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 2/8/2019 at 09:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Defense counsel shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-0817Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 2/8/2019. (lc) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-1118SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Dispositive Motions due by 4/30/2019. (AS) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-04-1219MOTION for Leave to File Ex Parte in Camera by United States Secret Service. (Thomas, James) (Entered: 04/12/2019)
2019-04-1520ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Ex Parte. (CS) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar