Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02536
Date Filed2018-11-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the FBI and senior officials of the Department of Justice pertaining to the closure of an investigation of the Clinton Foundation. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied it. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal, which the FBI also denied. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Litigation - Vaughn index

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-021COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5771737) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-022LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
2018-11-02Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-063SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
2018-11-154RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/15/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/15/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/15/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/15/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Aldrich, Jason) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-215NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-176ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-18MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 18, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2019-01-187MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-22MINUTE ORDER granting in part the defendant's 19 Unopposed Motion for Stay of all Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. It is ORDERED that the parties shall confer and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings within seven days of Congress restoring appropriations to the Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 22, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-02-018Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 1, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-159NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-03-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 18, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/23/2019)
2019-04-0311Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 3, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 4, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-04Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/3/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar