Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBurgest v. Freedom of Information Act
DistrictNorthern District of Georgia
CityAtlanta
Case Number1:2018cv04992
Date Filed2018-10-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Mark H. Cohen
PlaintiffEarl Hughes Burgest
also known as Earl Burgess
also known as James Brown
DefendantFreedom of Information Act Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-10-291APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Hughes Burgest. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (sap) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-01Submission of 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis to Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins. (sap) (Entered: 11/01/2018)
2018-11-132COMPLAINT filed by Earl Hughes Burgest. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bnw) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-133FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 Complaint, filed by Earl Hughes Burgest. It is recommended that this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/13/18. (bnw) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-134ORDER for Service of 3 Final Report and Recommendation by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/13/18. (bnw) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-14ORDER granting 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John K. Larkins, III on 11/14/18. (bnw) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
2018-11-14Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Earl Hughes Burgest re 3 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 2 Complaint, filed by Earl Hughes Burgest, 4 Order for Service of Report and Recommendation,. (bnw) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar