Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02563
Date Filed2018-11-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning investigations of former congressional IT staffers Abid Awan, Imran Awan, Jamal Awan, and Hina Alvi. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency issued a Glomar response neither confirming nor denying the existence of records. Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal, which was denied on other grounds. Judicial Watch filed a second more detailed FOIA request with the FBI for records about the investigation of the four former congressional IT staffers. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but denied the request under Exemption 7 (law enforcement records). Judicial Watch filed an administrative appeal of that decision, which was also denied by the agency. Judicial Watch then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5779692) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney for the District of Columbia, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-08Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/19/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/19/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/19/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/19/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-195Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is due on or before January 2, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/20/2018. (lcapm2) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/2/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-316MOTION to Stay re 1 Complaint, by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion for a Stay of Proceedings. This matter is hereby stayed. Within three business days of Department of Justice operations resuming, Defendant shall notify the court by when it will file its responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/7/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-02-057STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall respond to the complaint no later than February 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/6/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Responsive Pleading due by 2/25/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-258ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-259ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before March 11, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. Please see the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/25/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/11/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/10/2019)
2019-03-1110Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-03-12MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by April 4, 2019, which addresses the matters outlined in the court's Order of February 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/12/2019 (lcapm2) Modified deadline year on 3/21/2019 (zjd). (Entered: 03/12/2019)
2019-03-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-04-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-09MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by June 3, 2019, which updates the court on search and production efforts. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/9/2019. (lcapm2) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar