Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02565
Date Filed2018-11-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted ten FOIA requests to the Department of State for records concerning whether high-ranking officials were targeting career or civil service employees based on their perceived ideological preferences. The agency acknowledged receipt of all ten requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-071COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5780370) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
2018-11-07Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-093SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-194NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-285RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/9/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/9/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/16/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 11/15/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-106ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 7, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 11, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2019-01-077MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-078RESPONSE re 7 MOTION to Stay MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Status Report)(McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER. Within seven calendar days after appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice and Department of State, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report that proposes a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 7, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-02-019Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 1, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/03/2019)
2019-03-0110Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (McGrath, Daniel) (Entered: 03/01/2019)
2019-03-18MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 23, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 18, 2019. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 4/23/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/23/2019)
2019-04-2311Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-25MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 25, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/18/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar