Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02572
Date Filed2018-11-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffDEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE
Case DescriptionDefenders of Wildlife submitted FOIA requests to the Department of the Interior for records concerning potential drilling in the Coastal Plain of the Arctic National Wildlife Refuge. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Defenders of Wildlife filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
DefendantU.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE
1849 C Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20240
DefendantU.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-081COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5782226) filed by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Rule 26.1 Certificate, # 9 Summons Summons- U.S. Attorney General, # 10 Summons Summons- U.S. Attorney, # 11 Summons Summons- U.S. Bureau of Land Management, # 12 Summons Summons- U.S. Department of the Interior, # 13 Summons Summons- U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)(Rylander, Jason) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-082NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Senatore on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Senatore, Michael) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
2018-11-083LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE (zrdj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-134SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-20MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on Thursday, January 3, 2019, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 21. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall confer in advance of the Initial Scheduling Conference on (1) whether any records can be released, and (2) the proper next steps in this litigation. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/20/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-21Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2019 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Randolph D. Moss. (lsj) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-12-075RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/26/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/26/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/26/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT served on 11/27/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 11/26/2018; U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE served on 11/27/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Delivery receipts/Proof of Service)(Rylander, Jason) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-216NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of All Defendants (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-217ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-218Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Motion to Vacate Status Conference by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-219MOTION to Vacate by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE; (SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 8 TO VIEW.) (ztd) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 8 , it is hereby ORDERED that the initial scheduling conference set for January 3, 2019 is VACATED. The following schedule shall govern proceedings in this matter: (1) the Alaska State Office of BLM (hereafter, BLM) and Alaska Region of FWS (hereafter, FWS) will complete their respective searches and make their first interim productions to Plaintiff on or before January 31, 2019; (2) BLM and FWS will then continue to issue monthly, interim releases, on or before the last day of each month or the next business day, until the records processing is completed; and (3) Defendants will send to Plaintiff by January 17, 2019, a summary of the searches for BLM and FWS so that the parties can further confer about any adjustments that may be needed to the search parameters. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before February 7, 2019, to update the Court on the status of Defendants searches, records processing, and responses, and to propose a schedule for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/27/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-27Set/Reset Deadlines: The Alaska State Office of BLM (hereafter, BLM) and Alaska Region of FWS (hereafter, FWS) will complete their respective searches and make their first interim productions to Plaintiff on or before 1/31/2019; Defendants will send to Plaintiff by 1/17/2019, a summary of the searches for BLM and FWS so that the parties can further confer about any adjustments that may be needed to the search parameters; Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2019. (kt) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-01-1710Unopposed MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to All Deadlines by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pfaffenroth, Peter) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion to stay, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Within 14 days of Congress appropriating funds for the Department of Justice, the parties shall submit a joint status report. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/17/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-0611Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: The Alaska State Office of BLM (BLM) and Alaska Region of FWS (FWS) will complete their respective searches and make their first interim productions on or before March 7, 2019; BLM and FWS will then continue to issue monthly, interim releases, on or before the 31st of each month, or the next business day, until the records processing is completed; Defendants will send to Plaintiff a summary of the searches for BLM and FWS on or before February 21, 2019; and the parties shall file a further status report with the Court on or before March 14, 2019. It is further ORDERED that, in light of the restoration in funding, this case is UNSTAYED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/7/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-03-1412Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' consent motion for extension of time, Dkt. 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties shall file their joint status report on or before March 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/15/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2019. (kt) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-2113Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENDERS OF WILDLIFE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Plaintiff's Proposed Order)(Rylander, Jason) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar