Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02582
Date Filed2018-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Education concerning the borrower defense rule. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-091COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5784628) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-092NOTICE - Amended Summons as to the U.S. Attorney General by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT re 1 Complaint (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-093LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-13Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-134SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/13/2018) (zjd). (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/14/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION served on 11/19/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/19/2018. (See Docket Entry 5 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-147ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Haynes, Fred) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-14MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings on or before January 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 14, 2018. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-14Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 1/4/2019. (jl) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-048Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-04MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report five days after Congress restores appropriations to the Department of Justice or on January 25, 2019, whichever is earlier. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 4, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-259STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-01-25MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the plaintiff's 9 Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report on or before February 1, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 25, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-02-0110STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-0811STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-2212STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-25MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the plaintiff's 12 Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer regarding the status of the defendant's search and review of documents responsive to the plaintiff's FOIA requests and submit a joint status report on or before March 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 25, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-25Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint status report due by 3/6/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-0613Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-07MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 7, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
2019-03-1514Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-03-15MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 14 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 15, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 15, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-1515Joint STATUS REPORT by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-15MINUTE ORDER adopting the proposal in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 14, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 15, 2019. (lcdlf1) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar