Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBower v. United States Department of Labor
DistrictMiddle District of Pennsylvania
CityWilliamsport
Case Number4:2018cv02180
Date Filed2018-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable Matthew W. Brann
PlaintiffStephen Bower
Case DescriptionStephen Bower submitted a FOIA request to the Occupational Safety and Health Administration for records concerning a complaint filed with OSHA by Darla Badger-Topping alleging retaliation by her employer U.S. Xpress, Inc. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Bower filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Labor
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-091COMPLAINT against United States Department of Labor ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4596619), filed by Stephen Bower. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Letter to OSHA, # 3 Mailing Addresses)(ch1) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-092Summons Issued as to United States Department of Labor and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Packet) (ch1) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-093Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/9/2018. (jr) (Entered: 11/09/2018)
2018-11-13SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM emailed to Attorney Anderson B. Scott (lg) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-284PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Anderson B. Scott on behalf of Stephen Bower Attorney Anderson Scott is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4610604., filed by on behalf of Stephen Bower.(Scott, Anderson) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-29DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Scott is instructed to file page 3 of the petition for special admission indicating name and address of associate counsel (associate counsel can be Attorney Steele or any attorney who has been generally admitted to this Court), using the civil event "supplement"; do not refile the petition as another fee will be charged. (lg) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-295Supplement by Stephen Bower. to Docket Annotation, 4 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice, . (Scott, Anderson) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-29DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified Georgia bar record of Attorney Anderson Scott. (lg) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
2018-11-306SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Anderson Scott. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/30/18. (lg) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar