Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT v. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02606
Date Filed2018-11-12
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffGOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Government Accountability Project submitted FOIA requests to the Council of Inspectors General on Integrity and Efficiency for records concerning allegations against Daniel Meyer, who was removed from his position as Executive Director of Intelligence Community Whistleblowing and Source Protection after allegations against him were made to CIGIE. After hearing nothing further from the agency, GAP filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCOUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-121COMPLAINT against COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5787220) filed by GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Summons Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
2018-11-122NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of GOVERNMENT ACCOUNTABILITY PROJECT (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
2018-11-12Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-12-034RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY served on 11/26/2018 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-035RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/26/2018. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-036RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/26/2018. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-267MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-288VACATED PURSUANT TO ORDER ENTERED 2/6/2019.....ORDER granting 7 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/28/2019. (lcrcl2) Modified on 2/6/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-289ORDER regarding the filing of a Vaughn index and dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/28/2019. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index and Supporting Motions due by 2/4/2019. (lsj) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-0410Unopposed MOTION to Set Aside Set/Reset Deadlines, 9 Order And Motion For Extension of time to file Responsive Pleading and Status Report by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY (Graham-Oliver, Heather). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to on 2/5/2019 (jf). (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-0611ORDER granting 10 Motion to Set Aside and Motion for Extension of Time. The stayed entered 1/29/2019 is VACATED and responsive Pleading and Joint Status Report with Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/5/19. (lsj) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-2512ANSWER to Complaint by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY.(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-2513Joint STATUS REPORT by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
2019-02-27MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a further joint status report by 3/26/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/27/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-03-2614Joint STATUS REPORT by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 03/26/2019)
2019-04-0915MINUTE ORDER directing the parties to file a further joint status report by 4/22/2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/9/2019. (lcrcl1) (Entered: 04/09/2019)
2019-04-2216Joint STATUS REPORT by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-23MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/23/2019. (lcrcl1) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/22/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 04/25/2019)
2019-05-02ENTERED IN ERROR....MINUTE ORDER. (lcrcl1) Modified on 5/2/2019 (lcrcl1). Modified on 5/17/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-02ENTERED IN ERROR....MINUTE ORDER. (lcrcl1) Modified on 5/2/2019 (lcrcl1). Modified on 5/17/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-2217Joint STATUS REPORT by COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY. (Hendry, Melanie) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar