Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleUNION OF CONCERNED SCIENTISTS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02615
Date Filed2018-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffUNION OF CONCERNED SCIENTISTS
Case DescriptionThe Union of Concerned Scientists submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Energy and the Federal Energy Regulatory Commission for records concerning the influence of outside parties on agency decisionmaking in regard to energy policy. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. FERC disclosed 30 documents and told UCS that other records would be disclosed within 20 days. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, UCS filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DefendantFEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-131COMPLAINT against FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5788646) filed by Union of Concerned Scientists. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by Union of Concerned Scientists (Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-153SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-274RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wood, Hart) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-275RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/19/2018. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-276RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION served on 11/19/2018; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 11/19/2018. (See Docket Entry 4 to view document) (jf) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-077NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-178ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-18MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before January 22, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 18, 2018. (JK) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2019-01-189MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-02-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 4, 2019. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 5, 2019. (JK) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-04-01MINUTE ORDER denying as moot the defendant's 9 Motion for Stay and Extension of time. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 1, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/01/2019)
2019-04-0411Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL ENERGY REGULATORY COMMISSION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/04/2019)
2019-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 13, 2019. Signed Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 5, 2019. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
2019-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/13/2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/05/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar