Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02617
Date Filed2018-11-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning meetings between former FBI general counsel James Baker and attorneys from Perkins Coie, which represented the Democratic National Committee, in 2016. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-131COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5789131) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, # 4 Summons U.S. Department of Justice)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-132LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/13/2018)
2018-11-13Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-153SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/20/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/20/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/20/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/20/2018 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-205NOTICE of Appearance by Denise M. Clark on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-206ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-20MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule by January 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 20, 2018. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/11/2019 (tj) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-107Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-24MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Motion to Stay: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is stayed until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice. The parties' proposed briefing schedule, previously due on January 11, 2019, is now due 14 days after appropriations are restored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on January 24, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-02-088Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties will file another joint status report by March 13, 2019. The Court, at this time, imposes no deadline on Defendant to complete its search for responsive records. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on February 11, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/13/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-139Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 03/13/2019)
2019-03-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report by April 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on March 14, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/14/2019)
2019-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/29/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/15/2019)
2019-04-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report by July 12, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on April 29, 2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/12/2019 (tj) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar