Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWestern Watersheds Project v. Bureau of Land Management
DistrictDistrict of Idaho
CityDatabaseVersion 6.2.2 Boise - Southern
Case Number1:2018cv00505
Date Filed2018-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronald E. Bush
PlaintiffWestern Watersheds Project
Case DescriptionThe Western Watersheds Project submitted two FOIA requests to the Bureau of Land Management. The first FOIA request asked for records concerning BLM recommendations to Interior Secretary Ryan Zinke pertaining to proposed changes in coordination with state governments. The second FOIA request asked for records concerning Endangered Species Act consultations related to BLM's Wyoming Converse County oil and gas project. The agency acknowledged receipt of both requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to either request, Western Watersheds Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantBureau of Land Management
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-141COMPLAINT against Bureau of Land Management ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1811354.), filed by Western Watersheds Project. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Brooks, Talasi)
2018-11-142ERRATA by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project re 1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet . (Brooks, Talasi)
2018-11-143Corporate Disclosure Statement by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi)
2018-11-214Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management (Print attached Summons for service.) (alw)
2018-11-265Another Summons Issued as to Bureau of Land Management (Print attached Summons for service.) (jp)
2018-12-316NOTICE of Change of Address by Talasi B Brooks (Brooks, Talasi)
2019-01-027DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. This case is hereby stayed in accordance with General Order No. 339. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (km)
2019-01-038NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Lake on behalf of Western Watersheds Project (Lake, Scott)
2019-01-2810DOCKET ENTRY ORDER. Pursuant to General Order No. 339 and except as otherwise noted below, all applicable deadlines under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and any deadlines provided for in the Courts Case Management Orders or Amended Case Management Orders for those cases included in the Case List Report (incorporated by reference in General Order No. 339) are hereby extended a period of 35 days from the original deadline. Any deadlines that were separately set by stipulation and/or court order are not extended by this Docket Entry Order. Similarly, any deadlines for discovery requests are not extended if, as of December 22, 2018, the discovery could not have been timely served and completed prior to the original discovery deadline. Note that the Clerk's Office is in the process of re-setting all of these deadlines in CM/ECF. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (km)
2019-02-0711SUMMONS Returned Executed by Western Watersheds Project. All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration/Exhibit)(Brooks, Talasi)
2019-02-0712ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Bureau of Land Management.(Rodriguez, Joanne)
2019-02-0813NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Bureau of Land Management, Western Watersheds Project re 12 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 4/9/2019. (alw)
2019-02-1114LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/2/2019 10:30 AM in Boise Chambers before Judge Ronald E. Bush. Joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan due 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (alw)
2019-02-1215Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (cjs) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-1416AMENDED ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Bureau of Land Management.(Rodriguez, Joanne)
2019-02-1817MOTION for Summary Judgment Talasi B Brooks appearing for Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project. Responses due by 3/11/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-16)(Brooks, Talasi)
2019-02-1818ERRATA by Plaintiff Western Watersheds Project re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment Separate Statement of Facts . (Brooks, Talasi)
2019-03-1119MOTION to Stay re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 14 Litigation Order, (Unopposed) Joanne P Rodriguez appearing for Defendant Bureau of Land Management. Responses due by 4/1/2019 (Rodriguez, Joanne)
2019-03-1220ORDER RE: UNOPPOSED MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING AND VACATE TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Docket No. 19 ). Good cause appearing, the Court HEREBY GRANTS the Motion as follows: 1. The April 2, 2019 Telephonic Scheduling Conference is hereby vacated and will be re-set by separate order. 2. The March 11, 2019 deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Docket No. 17 ) is vacated and re-set to either May 15, 2019 or within 15 days after the search/production related to the second request is completed (as referenced within the Motion) whichever occurs first. Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (alw)
2019-03-1221DOCKET TEXT NOTICE of Hearing: Per DOC. 20, A Telephonic Scheduling Conference has been set for 5/15/2019 09:30 AM (Mtn.) in Telephonic Hearing - Boise before Judge Ronald E. Bush. *Counsel shall file a Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plan(s) no later than MAY 7, 2019, refer to DOC. 14 for instructions/forms. *Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate this Conference Call to (208) 334-1495.(lc)
2019-03-2622ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE (jp)
2019-05-0723SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Bureau of Land Management. (Rodriguez, Joanne)
2019-05-0724SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Western Watersheds Project. (Brooks, Talasi)
2019-05-1525DOCKET TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronald E. Bush: Telephone Scheduling Conference held on 5/15/2019. Talisa Brooks appeared for Pltff and Joanne Rodriguez for Defendant. Court reviewed the record and the filings in this matter. Counsel provided status of this case. The Court shall enter a CMO w/ deadlines as discussed on the record and set a TSC for 10am for 9/10/19, with Ms. Rodriquez to initiate the call (instructions in order). 9:30am tape start (15 min). (Court Reporter/ESR lc.) Audio File Location Boise - Courtroom 7. (lc)
2019-05-1526SCHEDULING ORDER.(Amended Pleadings due by 8/13/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/13/2019. Motions due by 5/15/2019. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/10/2019 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 7 before Judge Ronald E. Bush.). Signed by Judge Ronald E. Bush. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (st)
2019-05-1527RESPONSE to Motion re 17 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Bureau of Land Management. Replies due by 5/29/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Litman, # 2 Declaration of Keiosha Alexander, # 3 Declaration of Michael Robinson)(Rodriguez, Joanne)
2019-05-1528MOTION for Summary Judgment Joanne P Rodriguez appearing for Defendant Bureau of Land Management. Responses due by 6/5/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Litman, # 2 Declaration of Keiosha Alexander, # 3 Declaration of Michael Robinson)(Rodriguez, Joanne)
2019-05-1729DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: The correct time for the TSC on 9/10/19 is 9:30AM MTN., as stated in the Scheduling Order (Doc. 26). (lc)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar