Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02643
Date Filed2018-11-15
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffBRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE
Case DescriptionThe Brady Center to Prevent Gun Violence submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco, and Firearms for warning letters and the underlying reports of violations issued to federal firearms licenses since July 2017. The request was a follow-up to the Brady Center's earlier litigation for such records covering July 2015-July 2017. The Brady Center also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted the Brady Center's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Brady Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantBUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-151COMPLAINT against BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5793542) filed by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnett, Kevin) (Attachment 6 replaced on 11/16/2018) (zef, ). (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-152LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-15Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-163NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 17-cv-2130. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-164SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-265STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in this Court's Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/26/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-12-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/26/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/26/2018. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-127NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Arnold Pemberton on behalf of BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Pemberton, Alan) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-268NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-269Unopposed MOTION to Stay by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' motion to stay, Dkt. 9 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. This case shall be stayed until further order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and submit a revised briefing schedule as soon as Congress appropriates funding for the Department of Justice to resume work.. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/27/2018. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2019-02-0410Joint STATUS REPORT by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE. (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 10 , it is hereby ORDERED that the government shall file its answer on or before February 6, 2019; Plaintiff shall file its motion for consolidation on or before February 22, 2019; and the government shall release no fewer than 750 pages per month of records responsive to the Second Warning Letter FOIA Request beginning the month following the final monthly production of records responsive to the First Warning Letter FOIA Request. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/4/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/6/2019. Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate due by 2/22/2019. (dot) (Entered: 02/05/2019)
2019-02-0611ANSWER to Complaint by BUREAU OF ALCOHOL, TOBACCO, FIREARMS, AND EXPLOSIVES, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-07MINUTE ORDER: In light of the restoration of funding, this case is hereby UNSTAYED. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/7/2019. (lcrdm1, ) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-2212Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by BRADY CENTER TO PREVENT GUN VIOLENCE (Barnett, Kevin) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-23Cases Consolidated. Cases 17cv2130 RDM and 18cv2643 RDM have been consolidated pursuant to Minute Order entered 2/23/19.. The parties are directed to file all future documents in the LEAD CASE 17CV2130. The parties are advised NOT to select the SPREAD TEXT option when filing in ECF, as this will result in repetitive docketing and emails. (ztd) (Entered: 02/25/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar