Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNORDLICHT v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02626
Date Filed2018-11-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffMARK NORDLICHT
Case DescriptionMark Nordlicht, who was one of the subjects of an investigation in the Eastern District of New York, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between five named individuals and the New York Post, the Wall Street Journal, Bloomberg News, or Reuters during 2016. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the request on the basis of Exemption 6 (invasion of privacy) and Exemption 7(C) (invasion of privacy concerning law enforcement records). Nordlicht then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-141COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616095482) filed by MARK NORDLICHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd); Modified on 12/4/2018 to correct Defendant's name (ztth). (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-142NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MARK NORDLICHT. Case related to Case No. 18-403. (ztd) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-15SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) Modified on 12/4/2018 to correct Defendant's name (ztth). (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-193RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/16/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/16/2018.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/16/18. (ztd) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-11-264RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 11/20/2018. (tth) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar