Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02703
Date Filed2018-11-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Department of the Interior for records concerning scientific grants from Dec. 28, 2017 to the present. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told PEER it was being classified in the "other" category for fee purposes and that the agency was considering PEER's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5801566) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Summons DOI Summons, # 4 Summons USAODC Summons, # 5 Summons AG Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) Modified on 12/3/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-27Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-272SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-12-313Consent MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
2019-01-02MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 3 Motion to Stay. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/2/2019. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-294NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-01-295NOTICE of Resumed Government Funding by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-06MINUTE ORDER: The Court lifts the stay entered on 1/2/2019 and ORDERS that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint by February 12, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/6/2019. (lcjeb3) Modified on 2/8/2019 (zlsj). (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 2/12/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 02/06/2019)
2019-02-126ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by February 26, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/12/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/26/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-267Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-26MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report on or before March 29, 2019, updating the Court on Defendant's processing of Plaintiff's FOIA request. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/26/2019. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-02-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-298Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 8 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file another joint status report on or before May 29, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/29/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
2019-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2019 (lsj) (Entered: 03/29/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar