Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. et al v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02728
Date Filed2018-11-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffPROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC.
PlaintiffRYAN NOAH SHAPIRO
Case DescriptionProperty of the People and researcher Ryan Shapiro submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning whether Special Counsel Robert Mueller received a waiver because of his former employment at the law firm of Wilmer Hale. Property of the People and Shapiro also requested inclusion in the news media/educational institute for purposes of fees and asked for a fee waiver as well. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Property of the People and Shapiro filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-211COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5805200) filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-212LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC. (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-21Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zmd) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-263SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-264REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by PROPERTY OF THE PEOPLE, INC., RYAN NOAH SHAPIRO.(Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 11/26/2018)
2018-11-285ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney General (jf) Modified on 12/3/2018 (jf). (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-12-03NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No.re 5 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error and reissued.(jf) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-036SUMMONS (3) Reissued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, SUMMONS Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-107RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/3/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/3/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/3/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/2/2019.) (Kelly, Joseph) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-218NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Marie Cutri-Kohart on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-269MOTION to Stay all proceedings by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-2610ERRATA Text of Proposed Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 9 MOTION to Stay all proceedings filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2018-12-2911NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 9 MOTION to Stay all proceedings (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/29/2018)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendant's Motion for a Stay of Proceedings. This matter is hereby stayed. Within three business days of Department of Justice operations resuming, Defendant shall notify the court by when it will file its responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 01/07/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-2912NOTICE of Restoration of Appropriations by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-1513ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/15/2019)
2019-02-1914ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before March 5, 2019. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff; (4) whether a motion for stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See attached order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 02/19/2019. (lcapm1) Modified on 2/19/2019 (lcapm1, ). (Entered: 02/19/2019)
2019-03-0515Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Cutri-Kohart, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/05/2019)
2019-03-06MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report no later than June 15, 2019, updating the court on Defendant's production efforts and, if appropriate, proposing a summary judgment briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 03/06/2019. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/06/2019)
2019-03-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/15/2019. (zjd) (Entered: 03/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar