Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleFREEMAN v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02769
Date Filed2018-11-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeUnassigned
PlaintiffMICHAEL FREEMAN
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-21Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/21/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-211COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by MICHAEL FREEMAN. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-212MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL FREEMAN (zsb) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2019-01-183PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/9/2019. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
2019-03-075MOTION for Extension of Time to File, MOTION to Compel by MICHAEL FREEMAN (Attachment: # 1 Affidavit)(zsb) (Entered: 03/11/2019)
2019-04-086ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, within 30 days from the filing date of this Order, plaintiff shall provide his trust account statement (or the institutional equivalent) covering this six-month period immediately preceding the submission of the complaint. Otherwise, as previously advised, this case will be dismissed without prejudice (see Order for details). Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on 3/29/2019. (zad) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-05-017PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by MICHAEL FREEMAN (zsb) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar