Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-11-26 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5806998) filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons HUD, # 3 Summons U.S. Attorney, # 4 Summons Attorney General, # 5 Notice to Counsel/Party of Designation of Related Pending Case)(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/26/2018) |
2018-11-26 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/26/2018) |
2018-11-26 | 3 | NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 18-cv-00114-KBJ. (zef, ) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/27/2018) (zef, ). (Entered: 11/27/2018) |
2018-11-26 | | Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018) |
2018-11-27 | 4 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/27/2018) (zef, ). Modified on 11/27/2018 (zef, ). (Entered: 11/27/2018) |
2018-11-27 | 5 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE to HUD re 3 Notice of Related Case, 1 Complaint, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON. Related document: 3 Notice of Related Case, 1 Complaint, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON.(Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 11/27/2018) |
2018-11-29 | 6 | SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (jf) (Entered: 11/29/2018) |
2018-12-12 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/10/2018., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/10/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/9/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 12/7/2018 (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 12/12/2018) |
2018-12-19 | | MINUTE ORDER requiring Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington ("CREW") to show cause why this case should not be consolidated with CREW v. U.S. Department of Housing & Urban Development, 18-cv-0114 (KBJ). CREW is a plaintiff in both cases, both complaints allege that HHS has an improper policy and practice of denying FOIA fee waiver requests, and many (though not all) of the factual allegations in the two complaints overlap. Consequently, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 1/9/2019, CREW shall SHOW CAUSE why the instant case should not be consolidated with the proceedings in 18-cv-0114. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 12/19/2018. (lckbj1) (Entered: 12/19/2018) |
2019-01-07 | 8 | RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON re Order to Show Cause,, . (Weismann, Anne) (Entered: 01/07/2019) |
2019-01-07 | 9 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/07/2019) |
2019-01-09 | | MINUTE ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that this case is CONSOLIDATED with Citizens for Responsibility and Ethics in Washington v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development, 18-cv-114 (KBJ) and that any further filings in either case shall be filed in No. 18-cv-114. The Clerk is directed to administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 1/9/2019. (lckbj1) (Entered: 01/09/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |