Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY v. UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02765
Date Filed2018-11-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY
Case DescriptionPublic Employees for Environmental Responsibility submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Personnel Management for records concerning the rationale for changing the definition of "senior leaders" for the 2018 Federal Employee Viewpoint Survey. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and asked PEER to specify a time-frame for the request. PEER did so. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PEER filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-271COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5809851) filed by PUBLIC EMPLOYEES FOR ENVIRONMENTAL RESPONSIBILITY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A, # 2 Exhibit Ex B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Declaration 7.1 statement, # 5 Summons USAODC Summons, # 6 Summons OPM Summons, # 7 Summons AG Summons)(Dinerstein, Paula) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/28/2018) (zef, ). Modified on 11/28/2018 (zef, ). (Entered: 11/27/2018)
2018-11-27Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (zef, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2018-11-282SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 11/28/2018)
2019-01-043Consent MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER GRANTING 3 Motion to Stay. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall file a status report within seven calendar days after Congress has appropriated funds for DOJ. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/7/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-284NOTICE of Appearance by Marsha Wellknown Yee on behalf of UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-02-015STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-04MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING Defendant's 5 Status Report. The Court ORDERS that: 1) the stay is LIFTED; 2) Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before February 12, 2019; and 3) the parties may file a joint status report, if one is necessary, on or before February 15, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/4/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/12/2019. Joint Status Report due by 2/15/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/04/2019)
2019-02-126ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT.(Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-13MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by February 27, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/13/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 2/27/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/13/2019)
2019-02-277Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-27MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 7 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by April 10, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/27/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/10/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 02/28/2019)
2019-04-108Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-10MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by May 2, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/10/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-04-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2019. (znbn) (Entered: 04/10/2019)
2019-05-029Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (Yee, Marsha) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
2019-05-02MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING the parties' 9 Joint Status Report. The Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further joint status report by June 12, 2019. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/2/2019. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 05/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar