Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSCHNEIDER ROTHMAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW GROUP, PLLC v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02821
Date Filed2018-12-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffSCHNEIDER ROTHMAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW GROUP, PLLC
Case DescriptionThe Schneider Rothman Law Group submitted a FOIA request to the Office of Civil Rights at the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning investigations of violations of the HIPAA Privacy Rule by HCA, Inc., Parallon Business Solutions, or any related entities. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Schneider Rothman filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-031COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5819635) filed by SCHNEIDER ROTHMAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW GROUP, PLLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Rothman, Joel) (Attachment 5 replaced on 12/4/2018) (zjd) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zjd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04SUMMONS Not Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (zjd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-042REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by SCHNEIDER ROTHMAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW GROUP, PLLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SCHNEIDER ROTHMAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW GROUP, PLLC.(Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-063Summons (1) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (ztd) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-074REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by SCHNEIDER ROTHMAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW GROUP, PLLC. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SCHNEIDER ROTHMAN INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY LAW GROUP, PLLC.(Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-075SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-116ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/11/18. (DM) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-137RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 12/10/2018 (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-13SUMMONS (1) REISSUED as to U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-148RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/11/2018. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-149RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the District of Columbia Attorney General. Date of Service Upon District of Columbia Attorney General 12/11/2018. Answer due for ALL D.C. DEFENDANTS by 1/1/2019. (Rothman, Joel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2019-01-0410Unopposed MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's 10 Unopposed Motion for a Stay and Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. As of December 21, 2018, the appropriations act that had been funding the Department of Justice expired and appropriations to the Department lapsed. Absent appropriated funds, Department of Justice attorneys are prohibited from working except in circumstances which do not apply to this case. Defendant requests that this action be stayed during the lapse in appropriations and that the Court extend all pending deadlines in this action commensurate with the calendar day duration of the lapse in appropriations. Defendant's motion is GRANTED. Defendant is ORDERED to file a Status Report seven days after Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice notifying the parties and the Court that the lapse has ceased and requesting that the parties' deadlines be appropriately extended. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1-7-2019. (lcckk3) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar