Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for Biological Diversity v. U.S. Army Corps of Engineers
DistrictMiddle District of Florida
CityJacksonville
Case Number3:2018cv01434
Date Filed2018-12-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeSenior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger
PlaintiffCenter for Biological Diversity a nonprofit corporation
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers for records concerning the updates to the decision file for the 2008 Lake Okeechobee Regulation Schedule from 2015 to 2018. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Biological Diversity filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Army Corps of Engineers
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-031COMPLAINT against U.S. Army Corps of Engineers (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14882715) filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons)(Lopez, Jaclyn) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-032NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger and Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson. New case number: 3:18-cv-1434-J-20MCR. (SJB) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-043SUMMONS issued as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, US Attorney, US Attorney General. (TSW) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-054NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 3 (MGG) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2018-12-175CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity. (Lopez, Jaclyn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-176RETURN of service executed on 12/17/2018 by Center for Biological Diversity as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers. (Lopez, Jaclyn) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar