Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleInformed Consent Action Network v. United States Food and Drug Administration
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv11237
Date Filed2018-12-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Valerie E. Caproni
PlaintiffInformed Consent Action Network
Case DescriptionThe Informed Consent Action Network submitted a FOIA request to the FDA for records concerning clinical trials relied upon by the agency approving the use of influenza vaccines by pregnant women. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told ICAN that it had no responsive records. ICAN then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Food and Drug Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-031COMPLAINT against United States Food and Drug Administration. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-15995622)Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network.(Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-032CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-033REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Food and Drug Administration, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
2018-12-04CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pne) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pne) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-044ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Food and Drug Administration. (pne) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-195NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/19/2018) (ks) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2019-01-036NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachael Lightfoot Doud on behalf of United States Food and Drug Administration. (Doud, Rachael) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-037LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Rachael L. Doud dated January 3, 2019. Document filed by United States Food and Drug Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Doud, Rachael) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-038AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint served on United States Food and Drug Administration. Document filed by Informed Consent Action Network. (Siri, Aaron) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar