Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02840
Date Filed2018-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice, the Department of Health and Human Services, the Department of Homeland Security, and OMB for records concerning the cost of implementing the family separation policy. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Justice told AO that its request qualified for unusual circumstances. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, AO filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW
DefendantU.S. MARSHALS SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5821905) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Yenouskas, Joseph) Modified event title on 12/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-043MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn S. Kerner, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 620 Eighth Avenue. Phone No. - (212)459-7460. Fax No. - (212)355-3333 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822091. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Glenn S. Kerner, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-074REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-105SUMMONS (12) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-116MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kimberly Prior, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - (617)570-3907. Fax No. - (617)523-1231 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5833280. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Prior, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission, Pro Hac Vice, of Glenn S. Kerner as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Glenn S. Kerner, Goodwin Procter LLP, 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10018, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 17, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's 6 Motion for Admission, Pro Hac Vice, of Kimberly Prior as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Kimberly Prior, Goodwin Procter LLP, 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 17, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-177MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- April Sun, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111-4003. Phone No. - (415) 733-6000. Fax No. - (415) 677-9041 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5844004. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of April Sun, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-18MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's 7 Motion for Admission, Pro Hac Vice, of April Sun as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that April Sun, Goodwin Procter LLP, 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 18, 2018. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-268NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of All Defendants (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
2019-01-029NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-1010MOTION to Stay (Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations) by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR IMMIGRATION REVIEW, OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 10 Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The motion is GRANTED to the extent that the defendants seek to vacate the impending deadlines in this case. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. It is further ORDERED that the impending deadlines in this case are VACATED pending further Order of the Court. It is further ORDERED that, on or before January 28, 2019, the parties shall file a joint status report regarding how this case shall proceed. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 11, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-1111GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 11, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar