Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02842
Date Filed2018-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and its components for records concerning communications between a list of outside individuals and organizations, as well as members of the Trump administration. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-041COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5822243) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Yenouskas, Joseph) Modified event title on 12/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-043MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn S. Kerner, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 620 Eighth Avenue. Phone No. - (212)459-7460. Fax No. - (212)355-3333 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822321. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-044MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John M. Ilardo, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 100 Northern Avenue. Phone No. - (617) 570-1523. Fax No. - (617) 523-1231 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822415. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-045MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen L. Taesuch, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - (415) 733-6180. Fax No. - (415) 677-9041 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822485. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-06Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-06SUMMONS Not Issued as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-076REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-107SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ztd) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the 3 4 5 Motions for Admission, Pro Hac Vice , as Additional Counsel for Plaintiff, with respect to Glenn S. Kerner, John Ilardo, and Stephen L. Taeusch, respectively. Those motions are GRANTED CONTINGENT upon each respective attorney's submission of a separate declaration by DECEMBER 18, 2018 , stating that he has reviewed and is familiar with the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on December 11, 2018. (lcckk1) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-118ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 12/11/18. (DM) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-139NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of All Defendants (Sroka, Scott) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-1810RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,, filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Ilardo, John) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-1811RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,, filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Kerner, Glenn) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-1812RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,,,,,,,, filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Taeusch, Stephen) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2019-01-0213NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0714MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hudak, Brian) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received Defendants' 14 Motion for a Stay and Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations. Defendants indicate that Plaintiff takes no position on a "reasonably short" tolling of deadlines commensurate with the lapse in appropriations, but would oppose a general stay. Accordingly, in an exercise of the Court's discretion, the Court shall GRANT Defendants' 14 Motion. The Court shall STAY the deadline for Defendants' answer or other response to the Complaint. The deadline is tolled commensurate with the length of the lapse of appropriations to the U.S. Department of Justice, the U.S. Department of Homeland Security ("DHS"), and the defendant components of DHS whose appropriations have lapsed. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report within seven calendar days of the restoration of these agencies' funding and the resumption of their operations. This Joint Status Report shall include what the parties understand to be the new deadline for Defendants' answer or other response to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on January 8, 2019. (lcckk1) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar