Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02844
Date Filed2018-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted two FOIA requests to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications between the agency and various outside parties. The second request asked for a search of identified keywords. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5822595) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Yenouskas, Joseph) Modified event title on 12/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-043MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn S. Kerner, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10018. Phone No. - (212)459-7460. Fax No. - (212)355-3333 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822823. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Glenn S. Kerner, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-074REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-105SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-106STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 10, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 3 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice . Mr. Glenn Stuart Kerner may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 10, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-117MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Kimberly Prior, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - (617)570-3907. Fax No. - (617)523-1231 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5833366. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Prior, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice . Ms. Kimberly Prior may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 11, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-178MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- April Sun, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111-4003. Phone No. - (415) 733-6000. Fax No. - (415) 677-9041 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5844034. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of April Sun, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff's 8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice . Ms. April Sun may enter an appearance pro hac vice for the purpose of representing the plaintiff in this action. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 17, 2018. (lcbah4) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2019-01-029NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-0910MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) STAYING, upon consideration of the defendant's 10 Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings in Light of Lapse in Appropriations, the deadline for the defendant's responsive pleading and ORDERING the defendant to file any responsive pleading within seven days of funding being restored. It is further ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file, by January 11, 2019, proof of service of the summons and complaint on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 9, 2019. (lcbah4) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's proof of service of process on the defendant due by 1/11/2019. (tg) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1111NOTICE of Filing Proof of Service by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT re Order on Motion to Stay,, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar