Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02845
Date Filed2018-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Health and Human Service's Administration for Children and Families and the Inspector General for records concerning the facilities at which children who were separated at the border from their parents were kept. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES
DefendantOFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-041COMPLAINT against ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5822666) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Yenouskas, Joseph) Modified event title on 12/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-043MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John M. Ilardo, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - (617) 570-1523. Fax No. - (617) 523-1231 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822847. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Ilardo, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-044MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn S. Kerner, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10018. Phone No. - (212)459-7460. Fax No. - (212)355-3333 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822891. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Glenn S. Kerner, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-045MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen L. Taesuch, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - (415) 733-6180. Fax No. - (415) 677-9041 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5822959. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen L. Taesuch, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04SUMMONS Not Issued as to ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney, U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-05MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 3 4 5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys John M. Ilardo, Glenn S. Kerner, and Stephen L. Taeusch are hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/5/2018. (lctjk1) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2018-12-076REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-107SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent) (tth) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-028NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-099MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by ADMINISTRATION FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL OF THE U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar