Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAMERICAN OVERSIGHT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02846
Date Filed2018-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Christopher R. Cooper
PlaintiffAMERICAN OVERSIGHT
Case DescriptionAmerican Oversight submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning emails containing the term "American Academy of Pediatrics" or "AAP." American Oversight also submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning guidance on former Attorney General Jeff Sessions' immigration enforcement memos issued in April 2017 and April 2018. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing further from either agency, American Oversight filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-041COMPLAINT against U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5822781) filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT. (Yenouskas, Joseph) Modified event title on 12/17/2018 (znmw). (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-043MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- John M. Ilardo, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 100 Northern Avenue, Boston, MA 02210. Phone No. - (617) 570-1523. Fax No. - (617) 523-1231 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5823117. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Ilardo, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-044MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Glenn S. Kerner, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 620 Eighth Avenue, New York, NY 10018. Phone No. - (212)459-7460. Fax No. - (212)355-3333 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5823128. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Glenn S. Kerner, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-045MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Stephen L. Taesuch, :Firm- Goodwin Procter LLP, :Address- 3 Embarcadero Center, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - (415) 733-6180. Fax No. - (415) 677-9041 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5823134. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen L. Taesuch, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
2018-12-04Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-076REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by AMERICAN OVERSIGHT.(Yenouskas, Joseph) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-12-107SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2019-01-028NOTICE of Appearance by Austin Ridgely Evers on behalf of AMERICAN OVERSIGHT (Evers, Austin) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-109MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Defendants' Motion to Stay. All deadlines in the case shall be stayed pending renewed funding. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/10/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10MINUTE ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney John M. Ilardo. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/10/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10MINUTE ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Glenn S. Kerner. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/10/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10MINUTE ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Stephen L. Taesuch. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/10/2019. (lccrc2) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar