Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02851
Date Filed2018-12-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffCENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS
Case DescriptionThe Center for Reproductive Rights submitted a FOIA request to the Department of State for records concerning the agency's decision not to include reproductive rights in its 2017 human rights report. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center for Reproductive Rights filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-051COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5823293) filed by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Notice of Related Case, # 9 Summons DOJ, # 10 Summons DOS, # 11 Summons USAO, # 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
2018-12-052NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS. Case related to Case No. 18cv2217. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-053LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CENTER FOR REPRODUCTIVE RIGHTS (zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-06Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-064SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-185RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/13/2018. (Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-186RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 12/14/2018 (Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-197NOTICE of Appearance by Damon William Taaffe on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Taaffe, Damon) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-198RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/13/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/12/2019. (Miller, Wendy) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2019-01-129MOTION to Stay by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Coles-Huff, Doris) (Entered: 01/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar