Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGRAVES GARRETT, LLC v. UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02863
Date Filed2018-12-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffGRAVES GARRETT, LLC
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Graves Garrett submitted 46 FOIA requests to the EPA for records concerning the Ramazzini Institute. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests, but after the agency either failed to respond to requests or limited the scope of the request, Graves Garrett filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-061COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5826049) filed by GRAVES GARRETT, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet, # 12 Summons Attorney General of the United States, # 13 Summons United States Environmental Protection Agency, # 14 Summons United States Attorney's Office)(Greim, Edward) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
2018-12-10Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zjd) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zjd) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-113GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 11, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-124LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GRAVES GARRETT, LLC (Greim, Edward) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-135MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Callie Pippin Raitinger, :Firm- Graves Garrett LLC, :Address- 1100 Main Street, Suite 2700, Kansas City, MO 64105. Phone No. - (816) 256-3181. Fax No. - (816) 256-5958 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5837968. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by GRAVES GARRETT, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Greim, Edward) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-18MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the plaintiff's 5 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Callie Pippin Raitinger, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Callie Pippin Raitinger, Graves Garrett LLC, 1100 Main Street, Suite 2700, Kansas City, Missouri 64105 is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on December 18, 2018. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2019-01-096RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/18/2018. (Raitinger, Callie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-097RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/18/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/17/2019. (Raitinger, Callie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-098RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. GRAVES GARRETT, LLC served on 12/17/2018 (Raitinger, Callie) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar