Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAGUIAR v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02823
Date Filed2018-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ketanji Brown Jackson
PlaintiffSTEPHEN AGUIAR
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-11-30Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 11/30/2018. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zrdj) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-11-301COMPLAINT against EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS with Jury Demand filed by STEPHEN AGUIAR.(zrdj) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-11-302MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by STEPHEN AGUIAR (zrdj) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2018-11-303PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by STEPHEN AGUIAR (zrdj) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
2019-01-094ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $0.00 from Prison Account of STEPHEN AGUIAR and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/31/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-11Case Reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar