Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictWestern District of Pennsylvania
CityPittsburgh
Case Number2:2018cv01642
Date Filed2018-12-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Nora Barry Fischer
PlaintiffPROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL
Case DescriptionIn 2016, the Project on Predatory Lending at Harvard Law School submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records produced in discovery in DOJ's lawsuit against Education Management. It eventually responded to the request by denying it entirely under several exemptions. The Project filed new FOIA requests for records concerning how its original FOIA request was processed. The Project also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further, the Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 315-4958272), filed by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Index, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F) (sdp) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-104Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE IN Pgh. (sdp) (sdp) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-102NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-103ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 12/10/18. (jg) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-125AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on United States Department of Justice on December 12, 2018, filed by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-126AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Acting Attorney General of the United States, Matthew G. Whitaker on December 12, 2018, filed by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-127AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Civil Process Clerk, United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Pennsylvania on December 12, 2018, filed by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-13Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE on 1/11/2019 (sdp) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-208SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/11/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Return Receipts) (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-21Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE on 1/16/2019 (sdp) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-039NOTICE of Appearance by Karen Gal-Or on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gal-Or, Karen) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-0810MOTION for attorney Stephen J. Emedi to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4986424) by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-0811MOTION for attorney Toby R. Merrill to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4986542) by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-0912ORDER granting 10 Motion for Stephen J. Emedi, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-0913ORDER granting 11 Motion for Toby R. Merrill, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-0914MOTION for attorney Eileen M. Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4987012) by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-0915ORDER granting 14 Motion for Eileen M. Connor, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-0916MOTION for attorney Jennifer D. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-4987865) by PROJECT ON PREDATORY STUDENT LENDING OF THE LEGAL SERVICES CENTER OF HARVARD LAW SCHOOL. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Proposed Order) (Emedi, Stephen) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-0917ORDER granting 16 Motion for Jennifer D. Bennett, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 1/9/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jg) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar