Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHuman Rights Watch v. U.S. Central Command et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv11503
Date Filed2018-12-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Edgardo Ramos
PlaintiffHuman Rights Watch
Case DescriptionHuman Rights Watch submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Central Command and other components of the Department of Defense for records concerning alleged mistreatment of detainees held by U.S. or Afghani military forces in Afghanistan from September 2001 to the present. Human Rights Watch also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request and a number of them denied Human Rights Watch's request for expedited processing. After hearing nothing substantive from any component, Human Rights Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Central Command
DefendantU.S. Department of the Air Force
DefendantU.S. Department of the Army
DefendantU.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General
DefendantU.S. Marine Corps
DefendantU.S. Department of the Navy
DefendantOffice of the Secretary of Defense
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-101COMPLAINT against Office of the Secretary of Defense, U.S. Central Command, U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, U.S. Department of the Air Force, U.S. Department of the Army, U.S. Department of the Navy, U.S. Marine Corps. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16030141)Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits)(Langford, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-102CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-103FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Air Force, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne). (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-104FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Army, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne). (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-105REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Central Command, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-106FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Marine Corps, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne). (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-107FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Navy, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne). (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-108FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Secretary of Defense, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/11/2018 (pne). (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-109REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-1010FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Human Rights Watch.(Langford, John) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
2018-12-11CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pne) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-11Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pne) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-11Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1111ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Central Command. (pne) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-1112ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General. (pne) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-11***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Langford to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 7 Request for Issuance of Summons, 8 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): party name in the 'To' field on the PDF does not match party name on pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-2013FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Air Force, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj). (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2014FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Army, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj). (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2015FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Marine Corps, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj). (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2016FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Navy, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj). (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2017FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of Defense Office of the Inspector General, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) Modified on 12/21/2018 (sj). (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2018REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Secretary of Defense, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2119ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Secretary of Defense. (sj) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Langford to RE-FILE Document No. 15 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 16 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 14 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 13 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; Amended Summonses are only issued to parties who have been previously issued one. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-21***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney John Langford to RE-FILE Document No. 17 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; PDF must also state "AMENDED". Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2220REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Air Force, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2018-12-2221REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Army, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2018-12-2222REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Marine Corps, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2018-12-2223REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of the Navy, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Human Rights Watch. (Langford, John) (Entered: 12/22/2018)
2018-12-2724ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Air Force. (dnh) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-2725ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Army. (dnh) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-2726ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Marine Corps. (dnh) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-2727ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of the Navy. (dnh) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar