Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects et al v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2018cv07449
Date Filed2018-12-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Project
PlaintiffCenter for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law
Case DescriptionThe ACLU's Immigrants' Rights Project submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning parole decisions for asylum seekers who enter at a port of entry. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the ACLU's Immigrants' Rights Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement an agency of the Department of Homeland Security
DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-111COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12918684.). Filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons) (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 12/11/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-112Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 12/11/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-113Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 12/26/2018. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2018) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-134NOTICE of Appearance of Yakov P. Wiegmann by Mishan Raini Wroe (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-135NOTICE of Appearance of Eunice Lee by Mishan Raini Wroe (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-136NOTICE of Appearance of Sean Riordan by Mishan Raini Wroe (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 12/13/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-197MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice with Proposed Order (Filing fee $ 310.00, receipt number 0971-12939997.) filed by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Projects, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Tan, Michael) (Filed on 12/19/2018) Modified on 12/19/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-198Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-199Summons Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2018) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
2018-12-2110CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union Immigrants' Right Project, Center for Gender & Refugee Studies at the University of California Hastings College of the Law.. (Wroe, Mishan) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2111Order, signed 12/21/18, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael King Thomas Tan.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2018) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2018-12-2712CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 12/27/2018) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-2713STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Winslow, Sara) (Filed on 12/27/2018) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
2018-12-3114Order, signed 12/31/18 as modified, by Chief Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 13 Stipulation to Stay Case. Case Management Statement due by 4/5/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/12/2019 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/31/2018) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar