Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv02900
Date Filed2018-12-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffCOMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE
Case DescriptionThe Competitive Enterprise Institute submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Energy for records concerning a tax credit for capturing carbon dioxide. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CEI filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-111COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5833163) filed by COMPETITIVE ENTERPRISE INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Attorney General, # 3 Summons District Attorney, # 4 Summons Department of Energy)(Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-12Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-122SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-213RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/17/2018. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/16/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF ENERGY served on 12/17/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/17/2018. (Watkins, Charles) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar