Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNew York Civil Liberties Union v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2018cv11557
Date Filed2018-12-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ronnie Abrams
PlaintiffNew York Civil Liberties Union
Case DescriptionThe New York Civil Liberties Union submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning custody determinations. NYCLU also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. It denied the NYCLU's request for expedited processing but granted its request for a fee waiver. The NYCLU filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of expedited processing. The agency upheld its denial of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, NYCLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-111COMPLAINT against United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16035069)Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit FOIA Request)(Austin, Paige) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-112CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Austin, Paige) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-113RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union.(Austin, Paige) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
2018-12-12***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paige Austin. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-12CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pc) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-12Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pc) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-12Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-124REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Austin, Paige) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-135ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dnh) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
2018-12-176ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. Plaintiff is directed to notify the Court when service has been executed on Defendant, after which the Court will promptly schedule an initial conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/17/2018) (anc) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-177NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher T Dunn on behalf of New York Civil Liberties Union. (Dunn, Christopher) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-188SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/17/2019. Service was accepted by Haojun Li, Civil Clerk. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Exhibit to Affidavit)(Austin, Paige) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-189NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Edward Krause on behalf of United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Krause, Andrew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
2018-12-2010ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Foley Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/20/2018) (rj) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
2018-12-2711STANDING ORDER M10-468: The United States Attorney's Office shall notify the Court immediately upon the restoration of Department of Justice funding. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 12/27/18) (yv) (Entered: 01/02/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar