Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBunch v. United States Department of Education
DistrictDistrict of Colorado
CityDenver
Case Number1:2018cv03214
Date Filed2018-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Robert E. Blackburn
PlaintiffPeg Bunch
Case DescriptionPeg Bunch submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning contracts between the agency and private collection agencies. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Bunch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Education
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-12-141COMPLAINT against Department of Education (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6440418)Attorney Daniel James Vedra added to party Peg Bunch(pty:pla), filed by Peg Bunch. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Department of Education, # 2 Summons US Attorney, # 3 Summons Attorney General, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vedra, Daniel) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-142Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-143SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
2018-12-174ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/17/18. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
2018-12-185ORDER By Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/18/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 2/20/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar