Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMIDDLE EAST FORUM v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00008
Date Filed2019-01-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
PlaintiffMIDDLE EAST FORUM
Case DescriptionThe Middle East Forum submitted a FOIA request to the U.S. Agency for International Development for records concerning a grant given to World Vision, Inc., particularly for information about sub-grantee Islamic Relief Agency. MEF explained that it was particularly interested in an authorization given by the Office of Foreign Assets Control at the Department of Treasury. MEF's request was referred to Treasury. Treasury acknowledged receipt of the request. MEF and Treasury had some back and forth discussion over the scope of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, MEF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-021COMPLAINT Middle East Forum against US Department of the Treasury ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5866075) filed by MIDDLE EAST FORUM.(Smith, Clifford) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons) (zef, ). (Entered: 01/02/2019)
2019-01-03Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-032SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE TREASURY. (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-073ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/7/2019.(DM) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar