Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBARRACK, RODOS & BACINE v. OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00020
Date Filed2019-01-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Reggie B. Walton
PlaintiffBARRACK, RODOS & BACINE
Case DescriptionThe law firm of Barrack, Rodos & Bacine filed a FOIA request with the Office of Personnel Management for records concerning WageWorks' response to OPM's request for proposal pertaining to management of federal flexible spending account program services. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the law firm filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-031COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5868143) filed by BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Rosen, Mark) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/4/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 01/03/2019)
2019-01-04Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-042REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by BARRACK, RODOS & BACINE.(Rosen, Mark) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-093SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT. (jf) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-02-074NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Todd Cohen on behalf of OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/07/2019)
2019-02-085Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF PERSONNEL MANAGEMENT (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 02/08/2019)
2019-02-11MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's Complaint on or before March 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 11, 2019. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Answer/Response due by 3/28/2019 (hs) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar