Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCenter for Biological Diversity v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service
DistrictEastern District of North Carolina
CityNorthern Division
Case Number2:2019cv00001
Date Filed2019-01-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Terrence W. Boyle
PlaintiffCenter for Biological Diversity
Case DescriptionThe Center for Biological Diversity submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service for records concerning the agency's recommendations based on its evaluation of the Red Wolf Recovery Program. The agency ultimately told the Center that it was withholding eight records under Exemption 5 (deliberative process privilege) but did not provide a final determination. After hearing nothing further from the agency, the Center filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Fish and Wildlife Service
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-041COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4777355.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Attachment to civil cover sheet, # 3 Financial disclosure, # 4 Notice of appearance, # 5 Proposed Summons Proposed summons for defendant, # 6 Proposed Summons Proposed summons for U.S. Attorney, # 7 Proposed Summons Proposed summons for U.S. Attorney General) (de Jong, Perrin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-04NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding 1 Complaint - The financial disclosure statement and the Notice of Appearance are both stand alone documents. Counsel needs to refile the financial disclosure statement using the event "Other Documents - Financial Disclosure Statement" and a separate filing using the event "Notices-Notice of Appearance". (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-042Notice of Appearance filed by Perrin W. de Jong on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity. (de Jong, Perrin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-043Financial Disclosure Statement by Center for Biological Diversity (de Jong, Perrin) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-044Summons Issued as to United States Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney's Office and the Acting U.S. Attorney General. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-045TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this Case is reassigned to Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. District Judge James C. Dever, III is no longer assigned to case All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 2:19-CV-1-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/4/2019. (Moore, P. ) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-046Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Collette L. Adkins on behalf of Center for Biological Diversity. (Adkins, Collette) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
2019-01-257Summons Returned Executed by Certified Mail filed by Center for Biological Diversity as to United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 1/18/2019. (de Jong, Perrin) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
2019-02-128Notice of Appearance filed by Roberto F. Ramirez on behalf of United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
2019-02-129MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1 Complaint, up to and including March 21, 2019 filed by United States Fish and Wildlife Service. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Ramirez, Roberto) (Entered: 02/12/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar