Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00029
Date Filed2019-01-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffWASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS
Case DescriptionThe Washington Lawyers' Committee for Civil Rights and Urban Affairs submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning the demolition or disposition approval given by the agency to the District of Columbia Housing Authority for the Barry Farm Dwellings. The Committee also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from the agency the Committee filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-071COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5872954) filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - HUD Letter to DCHA re: Demolition dated January 20, 2017, # 2 Exhibit B - DCHA Response to Zoning Decision dated April 27, 2018, # 3 Exhibit C - FOIA Request Letter dated June 11, 2018, # 4 Exhibit D - HUD Response to FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit E - FOIA Request Follow-up Emails, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2019)
2019-01-08Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-082SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
2019-01-173REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE TO UNITED STATES ATTORNEY AND U.S. ATTORNEY GENERAL re 1 Complaint,, filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-174LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests from Plaintiff. (Edmondson, Joseph) Modified event on 1/18/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-01-185SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING & URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (tth) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-246ERRATA Exhibit E by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS 1 Complaint,, filed by WASHINGTON LAWYERS' COMMITTEE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND URBAN AFFAIRS. (Edmondson, Joseph) (Entered: 01/24/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar