Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-01-08 | 1 | COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5877340) filed by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Certificate Rule LCvR 26.1., # 5 Summons US Department of Health and Human Services, # 6 Summons Office of Inspector General for the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services)(Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2019) |
2019-01-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/09/2019) |
2019-01-09 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. (zmd) (Entered: 01/09/2019) |
2019-01-09 | 3 | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE re 1 Complaint, filed by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by SQUIRE PATTON BOGGS (US) LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/09/2019) |
2019-01-10 | 4 | SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (ztd) (Entered: 01/10/2019) |
2019-01-15 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/10/2019 (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2019) |
2019-01-15 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019. (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2019) |
2019-01-15 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/19. (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2019) |
2019-01-15 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/10/2019 (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2019) |
2019-01-15 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/9/2019. (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2019) |
2019-01-15 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/10/19. (Nash, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2019) |
2019-02-11 | 11 | NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2019) |
2019-02-11 | 12 | ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2019) |
2019-02-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues no later than 3/26/19. The joint status report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/26/19. (DJS) (Entered: 02/26/2019) |
2019-02-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/26/2019. (tb) (Entered: 02/27/2019) |
2019-03-26 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/26/2019) |
2019-04-25 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by OFFICE OF INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR THE DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2019) |
2019-05-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' notification that this FOIA action has been resolved 14 , this matter is hereby dismissed. The parties shall file a joint status report on the issue of attorneys' fees by April 25, 2019. To the extent the report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/16/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/16/2019) |
2019-05-17 | | AMENDED MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' notification that this FOIA action has been resolved 14, this matter is hereby dismissed. The parties shall file a joint status report on the issue of attorneys' fees by May 25, 2019. To the extent the report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the report shall be accompanied by a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 5/17/19. (DJS) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
2019-05-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2019. (tb) (Entered: 05/17/2019) |
Hide Docket Events |