Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleOpen Society Justice Initiative v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv00234
Date Filed2019-01-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Paul A. Engelmayer
PlaintiffOpen Society Justice Initiative
Case DescriptionThe Open Society Initiative submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the National Security Agency, the Department of Defense, and the Office of the Director of National Intelligence for records concerning the killing of Jamil Khashoggi. The Open Society Initiative also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request, but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the Open Society Initiative filed suit.
Complaint issues: Public Interest Fee Waiver, Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantDepartment of Defense
DefendantNational Security Agency
DefendantNational Security Agency
TERMINATED: 10/15/2019
DefendantOffice of the Director of National Intelligence
DefendantDepartment of Justice
DefendantDepartment of State
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [138]
Opinion/Order [146]
Opinion/Order [165]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-091COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16163411)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs FOIA requests)(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-092CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-093FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-094FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-095FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-096FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) Modified on 1/10/2019 (pne). (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-097RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
2019-01-10CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php . (pne) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10Case Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Catherine M. Amirfar to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Request for Issuance of Summons, 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the name of the party for whom the summons is being requested must be the first name that appears in the 'To' field on the summons request PDF; any name that follows the name of the party to be served must include 'c/'o', 'via', or 'attn'; party name in the 'To' field must exactly match party name as it appears on pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-108REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Central Intelligence Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-109REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Defense, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1010REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to National Security Agency, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1011REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1012NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative. (Singh, Amrit) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-1113ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Central Intelligence Agency. (dnh) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-1114ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Defense. (dnh) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-1115ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to National Security Agency. (dnh) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-1116ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (dnh) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-16NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge John G. Koeltl is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-1817CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time tolling answer deadline until 30 days from first business day following Justice Department funding restoration addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David S. Jones dated January 18, 2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit standing order staying certain civil cases affected by lapse in appropriations)(Jones, David) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-1818NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Amrit Singh on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative. New Address: Open Society Justice Initiative, 224 W. 57th St, New York, New York, 10019, 2125480660. (Singh, Amrit) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-1819AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Central Intelligence Agency served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; Department of Defense served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; National Security Agency served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019; Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk Supervisor. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/18/2019)
2019-01-2220ORDER granting 17 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/22/2019) (js) Modified on 7/1/2019 (js). (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-02-1421NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-2222CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-1329 and this action given identical FOIA requests addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/22/2019., CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: 1 Complaint, to set a uniform answer date of March 18, 2019 for all defendants addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/22/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2723ORDER granting (22) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (22) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (anc) Modified on 2/27/2019 (anc). (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-02-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Central Intelligence Agency answer due 3/18/2019; Department of Defense answer due 3/18/2019; Department of Justice answer due 3/18/2019; Department of State answer due 3/18/2019; National Security Agency answer due 3/18/2019; Office of the Director of National Intelligence answer due 3/18/2019. (anc) (Entered: 02/27/2019)
2019-03-1824ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/18/2019)
2019-03-1925NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer; and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/19/2019) (anc) (Entered: 03/22/2019)
2019-04-1526NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF PRO BONO COUNSEL by David James Sandler on behalf of Open Society Justice Initiative Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1527JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 4/15/2019 re: Initial Conference. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/15/2019)
2019-04-1828CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 4/18/2019 re: requesting initial conference be moved to 1pm on 4/19/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-1829MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (28 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 17 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court hereby adjourns this conference to noon on Friday, April 19, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 12:00 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 04/18/2019)
2019-04-22Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/22/2019. Amrit Singh & David Sandler present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 04/22/2019)
2019-04-2330SCHEDULING ORDER: The above-captioned actions having been consolidated, see ECF No. 23 in 19 Civ. 234, absent further order of the Court, all filings in these matters going forward shall be made under the docket number 19 Civ. 234. The parties shall negotiate in good faith to narrow the scope of the search or exclude categories of non-substantive records identified by Defendants. On April 26, 2019, and every Friday thereafter until directed by the Court, the Parties shall update the Court in a joint letter on the status of discussions between the Parties and Defendants' responses to Plaintiffs Requests; and as further set forth herein. Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 04/23/2019)
2019-04-2431TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 4/19/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kelly Surina, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/15/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/23/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-2432NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 4/19/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 04/24/2019)
2019-04-2633AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Central Intelligence Agency served on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by certified mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2634AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Service was made by certified mail and Also on the U. S. Attorney General. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2635AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. National Security Agency served on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by certified mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2636AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Office of the Director of National Intelligence served on 1/16/2019, answer due 3/18/2019. Service was made by certified mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2637STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 04/26/2019)
2019-04-2938MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (23 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 37 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ks) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-05-0339STATUS REPORT. (joint) and proposal for letter-briefing schedule regarding State's processing rate Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 05/03/2019)
2019-05-0640MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (25 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 39 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and approves the parties' proposed letter briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 5/13/2019. Responses due by 5/20/2019) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/6/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ne) (Entered: 05/06/2019)
2019-05-1041STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/10/2019)
2019-05-1042MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (41 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 27 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 05/13/2019)
2019-05-1743STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
2019-05-2044LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated May 20, 2019 re: opposition to the 5/13/19 DOS letter requesting the Court to approve States proposed processing rate of only 300 pages per month.. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
2019-05-2145LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated 5/21/19 re: parties' consent to the over-length letter (Dkt. 44) and requesting the court to accept the over-length letter. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Sandler, David) (Entered: 05/21/2019)
2019-05-2246MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (45 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 33 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court will accept the over-length letter on the consent of all parties. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(mro) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-2247MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (31 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 43 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/22/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(mro) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-2448JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 5/24/2019 re: weekly status update. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/24/2019)
2019-05-2949MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (36 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 48 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The Court adjourns State's May 29 and May 30 deadlines. The parties should confer and provide the Court new deadlines by June 4, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(rro) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-3050MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (32 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 44 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: Having reviewed the parties' competing letters, the Court's judgment is that a processing rate of 5,000 pages per month, beginning June 2019, appropriately balances the urgency of this particular request with the State Department's concerns regarding the burdens of making FOTA productions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/30/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 05/30/2019)
2019-05-3151STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-0352ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court reschedules the conference currently scheduled for June 4, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. to 4:30 p.m. that same day. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/3/2019) ***Pursuant to instructions from Chambers, Filed In All Member Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-0353MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (51 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 39 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-04Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 6/4/2019. Amrit Singh & David Sandler present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Arnoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-0554ORDER: At today's conference, the Court set the following deadlines: 1. The parties shall continue to provide the Court with joint weekly status updates, continuing June 7, 2019, and continuing every Friday thereafter; 2. The Department of Defense shall provide a proposed production schedule on June 17, 2019. It shall process 2,500 pages of responsive records by June 30, 2019, and thereafter process 5,000 pages per month; 3. The Department of Justice shall provide a proposed production schedule on June 5, 2019. It shall process responsive records at a rate of 5,000 pages per month; 4. The Department of State shall complete its search of classified and unclassified emails within 4.5 weeks; 5. The next status conference is scheduled for July 8, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 03:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/5/2019) (mml) (Entered: 06/05/2019)
2019-06-0755CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 6/7/2019 re: seeking limited clarification and/or modification of the Court's June 5, 2019 processing order as to DOD. Document filed by Department of Defense.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-0756STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/07/2019)
2019-06-1057MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (55 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 43 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter, filed by Department of Defense. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The Court appreciates the parties' collective efforts to create clearer proposed language. The Court adopts the language herein as superseding paragraphs 2 and 3 of its June 5, 2019 Order. Dkt. 54. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-1058MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (56 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 44 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The Court is cognizant of DOD's anticipated motion for reconsideration and authorizes the Government to attach a declaration in support. The Court reiterates, however, that unless and until the Court grants any motion for reconsideration, all Orders remain in effect. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/10/2019)
2019-06-1159TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/4/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Greenblum, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/12/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/9/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-1160NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/4/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/11/2019)
2019-06-1361MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1362MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1363DECLARATION of Mark H. Herrington in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1364DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/13/2019)
2019-06-1465STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/14/2019)
2019-06-1766PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Sandler, David) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-1767LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from David J. Sandler dated June 17, 2019 re: withdrawal as counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Sandler, David) (Entered: 06/17/2019)
2019-06-2168STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/21/2019)
2019-06-2169MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (53 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Letter filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Attorney David James Sandler terminated.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2170MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (54 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2171STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and the FBI, and their respective counsel, that: Plaintiff releases and discharges the FBI from any and all claims and causes of action that Plaintiff asserted - or could have asserted - in this litigation arising out of the FOIA request. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice with respect to the FBI, and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party; and as further set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/21/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) Modified on 6/25/2019 (anc). (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2772MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . / Plaintiff OSJI's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Reconsideration . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-2773DECLARATION of Catherine Amirfar in Opposition re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Email from Amrit Singh to Natasha Teleanu, dated May 31, 2019, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Email from David Sandler to Natasha Teleanu, dated June 11, 2019, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Email from Amrit Singh to Natasha Teleanu and Peter Aronoff, dated June 24, 2019, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter from Department of State to Amrit Singh, dated December 21, 2018)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-2874STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
2019-07-0175MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (74 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 60 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/1/2019) (ks) (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-0176MOTION for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee of $200.00 paid, receipt no. ANYSDC-17176407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Matthew D. Forbes in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Matthew D. Forbes Certificates of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Forbes, Matthew) Modified on 7/2/2019 (jc). (Entered: 07/01/2019)
2019-07-02>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (76 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 62 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. . The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jc) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0277ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 76 Motion for Matthew D. Forbes to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/02/2019) (ama) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
2019-07-0378STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-0379REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State . . Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-0380DECLARATION of Eric F. Stein in Support re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State .. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-08Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 7/8/2019. Amrit Singh & Matthew Forbes present for Plaintiff. Natasha Teleanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-0981ORDER: At today's conference, the Court set the following dates and deadlines: 1. The parties shall provide the Court with joint bi-weekly status updates, beginning July 18, 2019, and continuing every other Thursday thereafter; 2. The next status conference is scheduled for August 8, 2019 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED., Status Conference set for 8/8/2019 at 02:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(rj) (Entered: 07/09/2019)
2019-07-1682TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 7/8/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Rose Prater, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-1683NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 7/8/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 07/16/2019)
2019-07-1884STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-1985MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (84 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 68 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and the parties' ongoing efforts to discuss technologies that would make FOIA productions more relevant and efficient. The Court does not require a supplement to this letter before the next scheduled bi-weekly update unless the parties believe they have reached an impasse on an issue that requires the Court's attention. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/19/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(anc) (Entered: 07/19/2019)
2019-08-0186LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Matthew D. Forbes dated August 1, 2019. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Forbes, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0187ORDER granting (86) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; granting (70) Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE: Granted. The status conference currently scheduled for August 8, 2019 is hereby adjourned to August 12, 2019 at 10:00. (Status Conference set for 8/12/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/1/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0188STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 08/01/2019)
2019-08-0289MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (72 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 88 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Central Intelligence Agency, National Security Agency ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and will take up any outstanding issues at the next conference. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(cf) (Entered: 08/02/2019)
2019-08-0690OPINION & ORDER re: (61 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 47 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) MOTION for Reconsideration or modification of Court's processing orders as to DOD and State : For the reasons reviewed above, the Court denies the motions by the State Department and DOD for reconsideration of the monthly processing rates set by the Court. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to deny the motion pending at Dkt. 61. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/6/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 08/06/2019)
2019-08-0991LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated August 9, 2019 re: August 12, 2019 conference. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 19, 2019, # 2 Exhibit B Intentionally Left Blank, # 3 Exhibit C-Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 30, 2019, # 4 Exhibit D Letter from C. Amirfar to Govts Counsel, Aug. 1, 2019, # 5 Exhibit E Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, June 28, 2019, # 6 Exhibit F Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, July 31, 2019, # 7 Exhibit G - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, June 27, 2019)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-0992LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 8/9/2019 re: response to plaintiff's letter. Document filed by Department of Defense, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/09/2019)
2019-08-1093LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages /Letter Motion Requesting Permission to File Overlength Letter (Docket No. 91 in 19-cv-234 and 75 in 19-cv-1329) addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated August 10, 2019. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Three-Page Letter from C. Amirfar to the Hon. Paul A. Engelmayer, # 2 Exhibit A - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 19, 2019, # 3 Exhibit B Intentionally Left Blank, # 4 Exhibit C - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, July 30, 2019, # 5 Exhibit D - Letter from C. Amirfar to Govts Counsel, Aug. 1, 2019, # 6 Exhibit E - Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, June 28, 2019, # 7 Exhibit F - Letter from S. Weetman to A. Singh, July 31, 2019, # 8 Exhibit G - Letter from N. Teleanu to OSJI Counsel, June 27, 2019)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 08/10/2019)
2019-08-1394ORDER: At yesterday's conference, the Court set the following deadlines: 1. By August 26, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter reporting on the outcomes of the State Department's test of certain search terms and setting out their respective views as to this subject. 2. Also by August 26, 2019, the parties shall file a joint letter reporting on the State Department's efforts to prioritize processing of documents consistent with Plaintiff's preferences. 3. The next status conference is scheduled for September 27, 2019 at 9 a.m. The parties are to file a joint status letter three days prior to the conference. (Status Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-1395ORDER granting (93) Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/13/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jca) (Entered: 08/13/2019)
2019-08-2296TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 8/12/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kristen Carannante, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-2297NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 8/12/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/22/2019)
2019-08-2698STATUS REPORT. (joint) per the Court's August 13 order Document filed by Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 08/26/2019)
2019-09-2499STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of Justice, Department of State, National Security Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of Justice, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/24/2019)
2019-09-27Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Status Conference held on 9/27/2019. Amrit Singh & Ashika Singh present for Plaintiff. AUSAs Natasha Telanu & Peter Aronoff present for Defendants. Court reporter present. (ajs) (Entered: 09/27/2019)
2019-10-03100ORDER: At the conference on September 27, 2019, the Court adopted the following briefing schedule, suggested by the parties in their joint status update, Dkt. 99, for the cross-motions for summary judgment to be filed by CIA and ODNI together and by OSJI: CIA and ODNI's brief in support of their summary judgment motion is due December 5, 2019; OSJI' s brief in support of its summary judgment motion and in opposition to CIA and ODNI's motion is due January 16, 2020; CIA and ODNI's brief containing their reply and their opposition to OSJI's motion is due February 6, 2020; and OSJI's reply brief is due February 27, 2020. The parties are instructed to submit a joint status update outlining the status of the case as to all parties every four weeks, with the first letter due October 25, 2019. (Motions due by 1/16/2020. Responses due by 2/6/2020. Replies due by 2/27/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-07101TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 9/27/2019 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Pamela Utter, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/7/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-07102NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 9/27/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-10-11103PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by National Security Agency, Department of Justice. (Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/11/2019)
2019-10-15104STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANTS NATIONAL SECURITY AGENCY AND DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between Plaintiff and the NSA and DOJ, and their respective counsel, that: Plaintiff releases and discharges the NSA and DOJ from any and all claims and causes of action that Plaintiff asserted-or could have asserted-in this litigation arising out of the FOIA request. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice with respect to the NSA and DOJ, and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party, and as further set forth in this Stipulation of Dismissal. So ordered. National Security Agency terminated. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/15/2019) (rjm) (Entered: 10/15/2019)
2019-10-25105STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 10/25/2019)
2019-10-28106MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (85 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 105 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and looks forward to the parties' next joint status letter, due in four weeks. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/28/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ks) (Entered: 10/28/2019)
2019-11-22107STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-25108MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (107 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 87 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update and looks forward to receiving summary judgment briefing beginning December 5, 2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 11/25/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-05109LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 12/5/2019. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 110 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (js) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-06110ORDER granting 109 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. The Court will adopt the following briefing schedule: defendants' summary judgment motion is due December 9, 2019; plaintiff's opposition and cross-motion is due January 20, 2020; defendants' opposition and reply is due February 6, 2020; and plaintiff's reply is due February 27, 2020. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/6/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/9/2019. Cross Motions due by 1/20/2020. Responses due by 2/6/2020 Replies due by 2/27/2020. (jwh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-09111MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09112DECLARATION of Antoinette B. Shiner in Support re: 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09113DECLARATION of Patricia Gaviria in Support re: 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09114NOTICE of classified filing (classified declaration of Patricia Gaviria) re: 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09115NOTICE of classified filing (classified declaration of Antoinette B. Shiner) re: 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09116MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. (Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-20117JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated December 20, 2019 Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 12/20/2019)
2019-12-26118MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (90 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 117 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Letter filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 12/26/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(jwh) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2020-01-13119LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (110 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated January 13, 2020. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-14120ORDER: granting 119 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 119 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to (110 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Order on Motion for Extension of Time, addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated January 13, 2020. Granted. The Court will adopt the schedule proposed by the parties. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 2/7/2020 Replies due by 2/28/2020. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/14/2020) (ama) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-01-17121STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-21122MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (121 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 93 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 1/21/20) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(yv) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21123CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Responses due by 2/7/2020(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21124MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (111 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of OSJI's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21125MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment and in Support of OSJI's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21126DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Opposition re: (111 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Statement from President Donald J. Trump on Standing with Saudi Arabia, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of an interview with Vice President Pence, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Article titled President Trump on divided Congress, Mueller probe, foreign challenges, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Article titled Senate Dem on Armed Services panel: Trump lying about CIA report on Khashoggi, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of statements made by Secretary of Defense James N. Mattis, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Article titled Lawmakers livid after CIA director Gina Haspel a no-show for closed-door briefing on Khashoggi murder, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Transcript of a hearing before the Senate Select Committee on Intelligence, S. Hrg 116-75, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Article titled Trump Lied When He Said CIA Didnt Link Saudi Prince To Khashoggi Killing: Senator Jack Reed, # 9 Exhibit 9 - Article titled A 'Smoking Saw' Links Saudi Prince to Khashoggis Murder, Senator Says, # 10 Exhibit 10 - Article titled Jamal Khashoggi: US spy chief given deadline to name Saudi writer's killers, # 11 Exhibit 11 - Copy of a tweet from Sen. Tim Kaine)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21127DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Statement from President Donald J. Trump on Standing with Saudi Arabia, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Transcript of an interview with Vice President Pence, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Article titled "President Trump on divided Congress, Mueller probe, foreign challenges", # 4 Exhibit 4 - Article titled "Senate Dem on Armed Services panel: Trump lying about CIA report on Khashoggi", # 5 Exhibit 5 - Transcript of statements made by Secretary of Defense James N. Mattis, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Article titled "Lawmakers livid after CIA director Gina Haspel a no-show for closed-door briefing on Khashoggi murder", # 7 Exhibit 7 - Transcript of a hearing before the Senate Select Committee on Intelligence, S. Hrg 116-75, # 8 Exhibit 8 - Article titled "Trump Lied When He Said CIA Didn't Link Saudi Prince To Khashoggi Killing: Senator Jack Reed", # 9 Exhibit 9 - Article titled "A 'Smoking Saw' Links Saudi Prince to Khashoggi's Murder, Senator Says", # 10 Exhibit 10 - Article titled "Jamal Khashoggi: US spy chief given deadline to name Saudi writer's killers", # 11 Exhibit 11 - Copy of a tweet from Sen. Tim Kaine)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-01-21128LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument / Letter Requesting Oral Argument on Defendants CIA and ODNI's Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated January 21, 2020. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-02-06129CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file opposition/reply papers on cross-motions for summary judgment addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/6/2020. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06130ORDER granting 129 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/6/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines as to 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 123 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 2/12/2020. Replies due by 3/4/2020. (jwh) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-11131LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of summary judgment briefing schedule addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Peter Aronoff dated 2/11/2020. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/11/2020)
2020-02-12132ORDER granting 131 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to the Government's request for an extension is due today, February 12, 2020. In order for the Court to consider this request, the deadline for the Government's opposition and reply is extended until Friday, February 14, 2020. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/12/2020) (mro) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 2/14/2020 Replies due by 2/14/2020. (mro) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-12133LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Catherine Amirfar dated 02/12/20 re: Plaintiff's Letter in Response to Defendants' Letter Motion For Extension Filed at Dockets 131 and 102, respectively. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-13134MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 133 Letter, filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. ENDORSEMENT: The Court directs the Government to file a letter by Tuesday, February 18, 2020 at 5 p.m., explaining in more detail why a broader search is necessary. The deadline for the Government's summary judgment opposition and reply is extended untilFebruary 21, 2020. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 111 MOTION for Summary Judgment, 123 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment:( Responses due by 2/21/2020, Replies due by 2/21/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 02/13/2020)
2020-02-14135STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-02-18136MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (104 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 135 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the update and looks forward to the Government's letter today. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/18/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (rjm) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-18137LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha Teleanu dated 2/18/2020 re: response to Court's order (134). Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 02/18/2020)
2020-02-19138ORDER: The Court grants the Government's request in order to allow the Government time to supplement the CIAs search, as described in the Government's February 18, 2020 letter, and to ensure that the CIA has captured all responsive records. As a result, the remaining briefing schedule is as follows: The Government's brief containing its reply and its opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is due March 10, 2020, four weeks from the date of the Government's original request for an extension; and Plaintiff's reply brief is due March 31, 2020. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (111 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) MOTION for Summary Judgment, (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment , (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment: Responses due by 3/10/2020, Replies due by 3/31/2020.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/19/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 02/19/2020)
2020-03-10139MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-10140DECLARATION of Gregory M. Koch in Opposition re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-10141NOTICE of classified filing (Classified Declaration of Gregory M. Koch) re: (108 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Office of the Director of National Intelligence. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-10142NOTICE of classified filing (Classified Declaration of Vanna Blaine) re: (108 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/10/2020)
2020-03-13143STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-17144MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (143 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 112 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/17/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-27145LETTER MOTION to Stay the State Department's Monthly Processing Requirement addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 3/27/2020. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 03/27/2020)
2020-03-30146ORDER granting (145) Letter Motion to Stay in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE; granting (114) Letter Motion to Stay in case 1:19-cv-01329-PAE: Granted. The State Department's processing requirements will be stayed beginning in April 2020. The parties are to provide a joint update on the stay every two weeks, beginning on April 10, 2020. The Court hopes counsel and their families are safe and well during this time. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/30/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-31147REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment . / Plaintiff Open Society Justice Initiative's Reply in Support of Its Cross Motion for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Amirfar, Catherine) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-31148DECLARATION of Ashika Singh in Support re: (95 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment ., (123 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment / Notice of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Washington Post Article, # 2 Exhibit 2 - ODNI Email, # 3 Exhibit 3 - CIA Email)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-10149STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/10/2020)
2020-04-13150MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (118 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 149 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/13/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-24151STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-04-28152MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 151 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court thanks the parties for the update. The stay remains in place. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 4/28/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-08153STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-11154MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (122 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 153 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report, filed by Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Central Intelligence Agency. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates this update. The stay remains in place. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/11/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ama) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-11*** Set/Clear Flags *** Added flag(s):STAYED., Case Stayed Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE(ama) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-21155STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
2020-05-26156MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (124 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 155 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the update. The stay remains in place. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/26/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-06-05157STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Department of Defense, Department of State, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/05/2020)
2020-06-19158STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-22159MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (127 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 158 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: The Court appreciates the update. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/22/2020) (ks) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-07-06160MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (129 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The stay remains in place. Defendants are to provide any productions on the third Wednesday of each month, and the parties are directed to submit monthly status reports. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 7/6/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (rro) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-08-07161STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-07162MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (161 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 131 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The stay remains in place. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 8/7/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (mro) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-09-04163STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Department of State, Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-08164MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (163 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 133 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. the stay remains in place. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/8/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (ks) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-18165ORDER: The Court will hold oral argument in this case on Thursday, October 15, 2020, at 3:30 p.m., on the parties' pending cross-motions for summary judgment. This argument will be held telephonically. The parties should call into the Court's dedicated conference line at (888) 363-4749, and enter Access Code 468-4906, followed by the pound (#) key. Counsel are directed to review the Court's Emergency Rules and Practices in Light of COVID-19, found at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-paul-engelmayer, for the Court's procedures for telephonic conferences and for instructions for communicating with chambers. (Telephone Conference set for 10/15/2020 at 03:30 PM before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer.) (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 9/18/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-10-02166STATUS REPORT. (joint) Document filed by Department of State.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Aronoff, Peter) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-02167MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (135 in 1:19-cv-01329-PAE, 166 in 1:19-cv-00234-PAE) Status Report filed by Department of State. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 10/2/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (jwh) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-13168LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Natasha W. Teleanu dated 10/13/2020 re: recent Second Circuit decisions. Document filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Office of the Director of National Intelligence..(Teleanu, Natasha) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-14169LETTER addressed to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer from Ashika Singh dated 10/14/20 re: Supplemental Authority. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: # 1 Enclosure D.C. District Court decision)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE.(Singh, Ashika) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer: Telephonic Oral Argument held on 10/15/2020. (ajs) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar