Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleADVANCEMENT PROJECT v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00052
Date Filed2019-01-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffADVANCEMENT PROJECT
Case DescriptionThe Advancement Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security and the Department of State for records concerning visa denials for applicants from Cambodia, Eritrea, Guinea, and Sierra Leone. The Advancement Project also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. DHS acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the Advancement Project's request for expedited processing. The Advancement Project filed an administrative appeal of the denial of expediting processing. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement told the Advancement Project that it found no records responsive to its request. The Advancement Project filed an administrative appeal of ICE's no records response. The State Department acknowledged receipt of the request and denied the Advancement Project's request for expedited processing. The Advancement Project filed an administrative appeal of State's denial of expedited processing. After hearing nothing further from any agency, the Advancement Project filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Expedited processing, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
DefendantU.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-101COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5881453) filed by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons DHS, # 3 Summons Summons ICE, # 4 Summons Summons State Dept., # 5 Summons Summons US AG, # 6 Summons Summons US Attorney DC, # 7 Summons Summons USCIS)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/10/2019) (zef, ). (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-102MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jessica Alcantara, :Firm- Advancement Project, :Address- 1220 L Street, NW, Suite 850, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-728-9557. Fax No. - 202-728-9558 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5881663. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-103MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Yeu-Jeng Lai-Peterson, :Firm- Advancement Project, :Address- 1220 L Street, NW, Suite 850, Washington, DC 20005. Phone No. - 202-728-9557. Fax No. - 202-728-9558 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5881690. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-104ERRATA by ADVANCEMENT PROJECT. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-10Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-105SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-11MINUTE ORDER denying 2 , 3 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice: The Court notes that Jessica Alcantara and Jennifer Yeu-Jeng Lai-Peterson maintain an office within the District of Columbia. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.2(c)(2) ("Practice by Non-Members of the Bar of this Court"), "[a]n attorney who engages in the practice of law from an office located in the District of Columbia must be a member of... the Bar of this Court to file papers in this Court." Therefore, it is hereby ORDERED that the 2 , 3 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/22/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/21/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 6 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-227RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/22/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 7 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-228RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-229RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF STATE served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 9 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 01/22/2019)
2019-01-2610NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 01/26/2019)
2019-01-2811RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 11 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2812RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 1/22/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Jimenez, Losmin) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/28/2019) (ztth). (Entered: 01/28/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar