Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00056
Date Filed2019-01-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffDEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION
Case DescriptionDemocracy Forward Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Health and Human Services for records concerning its teen pregnancy program. DFF also requested expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and denied DFF's request for expedited processing. DFF filed an administrative appeal of the agency's denial of expedited processing. The agency acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, DFF filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-101COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5882168) filed by DEMOCRACY FORWARD FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons)(Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 01/10/2019)
2019-01-11Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-112SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-173RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/15/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/14/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/15/19., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES served on 1/15/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Morse, Josephine) (Entered: 01/17/2019)
2019-02-144ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.(Nebeker, William) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-145ORDER directing the government to produce a Vaughn index with a supporting motion within 30 days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 02/14/2019. (lcrcl3) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar