Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. v. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv00061
Date Filed2019-01-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Emmet G. Sullivan
PlaintiffPUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.
Case DescriptionPublic Citizen submitted a FOIA request to OMB for records concerning the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau's final rule on the Payday Rule. Public Citizen also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Public Citizen that its search had located 536 potentially responsive records. OMB later told Public Citizen that its request would be completed by January 2020. Public Citizen then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantOFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-01-111COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5883168) filed by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons to the U.S. Attorney, # 3 Summons to the Office of Management and Budget, # 4 Summons to the Attorney General)(Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PUBLIC CITIZEN, INC. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-11Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zef, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-113SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 01/11/2019)
2019-01-154STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 1/15/19. (Attachment: # Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 01/15/2019)
2019-01-165RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/15/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/14/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
2019-01-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/23/2019. (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-017RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET served on 1/28/2019 (Smullin, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/01/2019)
2019-02-148NOTICE of Appearance by Derek S. Hammond on behalf of OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET (Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
2019-02-149ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF MANAGEMENT AND BUDGET.(Hammond, Derek) (Entered: 02/14/2019)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar